Thomsen, Patricia Christine (CPSO#: 60957)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Oct 1990

Summary

Former Name: Harason, Patricia Christine (used until: 17 Jun 1990 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomsen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Thomsen ( CPSO# 60875 )
Dr. P. Thomsen ( CPSO# 60957 )

Business Address:
Suite B - 274 Lyden Road
Brantford ON  N3R 6B8
Phone Number: (519) 758-8626

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA CHRISTINE THOMSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMSEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1990