Thomson, Brian George (CPSO#: 56566)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1987 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 2004