Thomson, Bruce Robert (CPSO#: 25984)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 2397 Stoney Lake Island 18 Woodview, ON K0L 3E0
Instructions: Please send your request in writing to Dr. Thomson and include your name, address and contact information.
Date Received: 30 Jan 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 2013