Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Thomson, Carol Ann (CPSO#: 62588)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Dec 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
55 Wyndham Street North
Guelph ON  N1H 7T8
Phone: (519) 837-2283
Fax: (519) 767-2262
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

# 208 83 Dawson Rd.
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Canada
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carol A. Thomson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Thomson ( CPSO# 62588 )

Business Address:
Suite 208
55 Wyndham Street North
Guelph ON  N1H 7T8
Phone Number: (519) 837-2283

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
St Joseph's Health Centre,Guelph Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROL ANN THOMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1991