Thomson, David Mearl (CPSO#: 62395)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peninsula Family Health Team
24 Moore Street
Lions Head ON  N0H 1W0
Phone: (519) 793-3445
Fax: (519) 793-4604
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Peninsula Family Health Team
Tobermory ON  N0H 2R0
Canada
Phone: (519) 596-2305
Fax: (519) 596-2979
County: County of Bruce
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. M. Thomson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Thomson ( CPSO# 62395 )

Business Address:
Peninsula Medical Associates
24 Moore Street
Lions Head ON  N0H 1W0
Phone Number: (519) 793-3445

Business Address:
Pennisula Family Health Team
7275 Highway 6
Tobermory ON  N0H 2R0
Phone Number: (519) 596-2306

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Lions Head Site Lions Head
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID MEARL THOMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1992