Thomson, Glen Thomas Davidson (CPSO#: 58834)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 24 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1991