Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Thomson, Gregory Warren (CPSO#: 29222)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
581 Argus Road
Suite 300
Oakville ON  L6J 3J4
Phone: (905) 338-9900
Fax: (905) 338-9904
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Wyndham Manor
291 Reynolds Street
Oakville ON  L6J 3L5
Canada
Phone: (905) 849-7766
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Creek Way Village
5200 Corporate Drive
Burlington ON  L7L 7G7
Canada
Phone: (905) 825-6000 Ext. 8661
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gregory Thomson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Thomson ( CPSO# 29222 )

Business Address:
300 - 581 Argus Road
Oakville ON  L6J 3J4
Phone Number: (905) 338-9900

Business Address:
5200 Corporate Drive
Burlington ON  L7L 7G7
Phone Number: (905) 825-6000

Business Address:
Wyndham Manor
291 Reynolds Street
Oakville ON  L6J 3L5
Phone Number: (905) 849-7766

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY WARREN THOMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1977