Thomson, Harry Scott Noble (CPSO#: 15871)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 03 Dec 1959 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1956
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1956
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Feb 1960
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998