Thomson, Leanne Margretta (CPSO#: 65161)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1201 Queen Street
Kincardine ON  N2Z 3C1
Phone: (519) 396-6769
Fax: (877) 677-5470
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Leanne M. Thomson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Thomson ( CPSO# 65161 )

Business Address:
43 Queen Street
Kincardine ON  N2Z 1G1
Phone Number: (519) 396-3331

Business Address:
1201 Queen Street
Kincardine ON  N2Z 3C1
Phone Number: (519) 396-6769

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEANNE MARGRETTA THOMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993