Thomson, Linda Dawn (CPSO#: 30306)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Spanish

Education:Queen's University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-3232 Ext. 7766
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1055 Princess St
Kingston ON  K7L 5A9
Canada
Phone: (613) 536-3127
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomson and Thomson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Thomson ( CPSO# 30306 )
Dr. R. Thomson ( CPSO# 26504 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Business Address:
Ministry of Health & Long-Term Care
Negotiations & Accountability Management Division
Health Sevices Branch
1055 Princess Street, PO Box 168, 2nd Floor
Kingston ON  K7L 5T3
Phone Number: (613) 536-3054

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA DAWN THOMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1978