Thordarson, Ian Thomas (CPSO#: 64140)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Nov 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Nov 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist
Emergency Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Nov 1997