Thorne, John Carter (CPSO#: 30038)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
43 Lundys Lane
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3R7
Phone: (905) 895-1666
Fax: (905) 895-2413
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Carter Thorne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Thorne ( CPSO# 30038 )

Business Address:
43 Lundys Lane
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3R7
Phone Number: (905) 895-1666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 08 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN CARTER THORNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THORNE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1978