Thorne, Kenrick Duncan McDowall (CPSO#: 32716)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 05 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1981
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 08 Aug 2000
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 09 Nov 2000
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 30 Mar 2006
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 05 Apr 2006
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 05 Apr 2006
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2008
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 17 Dec 1999
Summary:

On December 14, 1999, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Thorne guilty of professional 
misconduct in that he verbally abused a patient (clause 1(1)3 of Ontario Regulation 856/93; that 
he committed an act or omission relevant tot he practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
unprofessional (clause 1(1)33) of Ontario Regulation 856/93; and that he engaged in conduct 
unbecoming a physician (clause 1(1)34) of Ontario Regulation 856/93. 
 
On May 29, 2000, the Discipline Committee ordered the following penalty: 
 
1.    Dr. Thorne appear before the panel to be reprimanded and that the reprimand be recorded on the register; 
 
2.    the Registrar be directed to suspend Dr. Thorne s certificate of registration to commence seven days from today s 
      date and continue until such time as he has provided Ms. P with a copy of all medical records in his possession 
      pertaining to the care and treatment of her and her family; 
 
3.    The  Registrar  be  directed  to  suspend  Dr.  Thorne s  certificate  of  registration  for  a  period  of  three  months,  such 
      suspension period to commence after Dr. Thorne has provided Ms. P with a copy of the medical records set out in 
      paragraph 2 of this Order and on a date to be fixed by the Registrar, not more than three months from the date the 
      order becomes final.    
 
4.    The Registrar is directed to suspend Dr. Thorne s certificate of registration for a further period of three months, to 
      commence on a date to be fixed by the Registrar, but such further suspension shall itself be suspended if Dr. Thorne 
      fulfils the following conditions: 
 
      (a)   that he complete a course designed or approved by the College in physician/patient communications at his 
            own expense;  
 
      (b)   that he complete a course or programme designed or approved by the College in office management at his 
            own expense; and  
 
      (c)   that he deliver written apologies addressed to the complainants to the College of Physicians and Surgeons 
            of Ontario. 
 
      If Dr. Thorne fails to deliver the apologies by June 15, 2000, or complete the required courses by December 31, 2000, 
      the Registrar is directed to suspend his certificate of registration for the further three months. 
 
5.    Dr. Thorne pay a fine to the Minister of Finance within 30 days, in the sum of $1,500.00;  
 
6.    Dr. Thorne pay costs to the College within 30 days, fixed in the sum of $3,000.00.  

    
7. In the event that the fine and costs under paragraph 5 and 6 are not paid by the dates specified, the Registrar is directed to 
   suspend  Dr.  Thorne s  certificate  of  registration  for  a  further  three-month  period  following  the  completion  of  the 
   suspension under paragraph 3. 
 
A reference to a fixed date (or period of time) may be adjusted on a proportionate basis, having regard to the date the Order 
becomes final. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 20, 1999