Thorne, Mary Jane (CPSO#: 60460)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010