Thorne, Susan Mary (CPSO#: 72198)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 309
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 274-7831
Fax: (613) 274-3271
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 721-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Clarke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Clarke ( CPSO# 72577 )
Dr. S. Thorne ( CPSO# 72198 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN MARY THORNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THORNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003