Thornley, Glenn Douglas (CPSO#: 31163)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Oct 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Little Lake Health Centre
Suite 402
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone: (705) 737-3422
Fax: (705) 725-7330
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 728-9802
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Georgian Bay Hospital
1112 St Andrew's Drive
P O Box 760
Midland ON  L4R 1N6
Canada
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

5 Beck Blvd.
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1C1
Canada
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Glenn Thornley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Thornley ( CPSO# 31163 )

Business Address:
Little Lake Health Centre
Suite 402
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone Number: (705) 728-8066

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 28 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLENN DOUGLAS THORNLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THORNLEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1979