Thornton, Mary Dawes (CPSO#: 64408)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Apr 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Laval University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 876-5028
Fax: (705) 876-5013
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mary D. Thornton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Thornton ( CPSO# 64408 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5028

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Aug 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY DAWES THORNTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THORNTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Aug 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 1995 to 31 Aug 1996
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1993