Thornton, Pamela Joy (CPSO#: 71178)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 19 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 20 Nov 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Nov 2000 to 20 Nov 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Nov 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Apr 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Apr 2004