Thornton, Tanya Helen (CPSO#: 77994)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 1120
268 Maiden Lane
St Marys ON  N4X 1B7
Phone: (519) 284-3450
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tanya H. Thornton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Thornton ( CPSO# 77994 )

Business Address:
St. Marys Medical Clinic
268 Maiden Lane
PO Box 1120
St Marys ON  N4X 1B7
Phone Number: (519) 284-3450

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TANYA HELEN THORNTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THORNTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2004