Thorogood, William David (CPSO#: 68043)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Delhi Community Health Centre
105 Main Street
Delhi ON  N4B 2L8
Phone: (519) 582-2323
Fax: (519) 582-1513
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William Thorogood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Thorogood ( CPSO# 68043 )

Business Address:
Delhi Community Health Centre
105 Main Street
Delhi ON  N4B 2L8
Phone Number: (519) 582-2323

Business Address:
Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3C 3T6
Phone Number: (519) 426-0750

Business Address:
West Haldimand General Hospital
75 Park View Road
Hagersville ON  N0A 1H0
Phone Number: (905) 768-3311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM DAVID THOROGOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOROGOOD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1996