Thorp, Patrick Stuart (CPSO#: 53250)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 25 Oct 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Oct 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Dublin, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 16 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 31 Dec 1987
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1996
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Oct 1999