Thorpe, Marilyn Beatrice (CPSO#: 56999)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Jack Peterson Health Centre
PO Box 1700 Stn CSC
Victoria BC  V8Z 2W2
Phone: (250) 721-8492
Fax: (250) 721-6224
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thorpe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 4 2014

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARILYN BEATRICE THORPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THORPE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jul 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1987