Thottungal, James Jacob (CPSO#: 87709)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 13 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University College, Cork, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 13 Sep 2007 to 05 Dec 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 06 Dec 2007 to 13 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 14 Oct 2008 to 13 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 14 Oct 2009 to 13 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 14 Oct 2010 to 13 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 14 Oct 2011 to 13 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Oct 2012