Thull-Freedman, Jennifer Dena (CPSO#: 81991)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Thomas Jefferson University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 02 Feb 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 11 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 11 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 11 Oct 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Feb 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2012