Thurlbeck, Sarah Margaret (CPSO#: 58705)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Apr 2005