Thurley, Jane (CPSO#: 56884)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Psychiatric Associates
#202
10 Alcorn Avenue
Toronto ON  M4V 3A9
Phone: (416) 944-1279
Fax: (416) 975-0129
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1849 yonge street, suite 711
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Canada
Phone: (416) 304-1779
Fax: (416) 304-0257
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thurley Murphy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Thurley ( CPSO# 56884 )
Dr. L. Murphy ( CPSO# 51877 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
10 Alcorn Avenue
Toronto ON  M4V 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 923-9688

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M6B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5120

Business Address:
Suite 711
1849 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone Number: (416) 304-1779

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANE THURLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THURLEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 27 Jul 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1987