Thurston, Wendy Ann (CPSO#: 52881)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 May 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
30 the Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6010
Fax: (416) 530-6025
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T.M. Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 5 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. Wendy Thurston Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Thurston ( CPSO# 52881 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 02 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WENDY ANN THURSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THURSTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 1990