Tibbles, Lee Anne (CPSO#: 61014)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Dec 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HRIC 4A12
4280 Hospital Drive NW
Calgary AB  T2N 4Z6
Phone: 403 220 3880
Fax: 403 210 9717

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 02 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEE ANNE TIBBLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TIBBLES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 11 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1992