Tiedje, Ingo Erich Heinrich (CPSO#: 26517)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Oct 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Killaloe Medical Center
R R 2
45 Mill Street
Killaloe ON  K0J 2A0
Phone: (613) 757-2095
Fax: (613) 757-3680
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Francis Memorial Hospital
P O Box 129
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Canada
Phone: (613) 756-3044
Fax: (613) 756-0127
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Valley Manor Nursing Home
88 Mintha
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Canada
Phone: (613) 756-2643
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 18 Jan 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 18 Jan 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Undertaking 1 of 2

            As from December 23, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ingo Erich Heinrich
            Tiedje, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Tiedje to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                                                of
                              DR. INGO ERICH HEINRICH TIEDJE
                                          ("Dr. Tiedje")
                                                to 
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Tiedje, certificate of registration number 26517, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately ("Effective Date").

            (4)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  (b)   I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Appendix
                              "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review at least twenty (20) of my patient charts once every
                              visit;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me once every month for the first six (6) months,
                              and then at the ninth (9th) month and at the twelfth (12th)
                              month of the Clinical Supervision;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vii) Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              quarter, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my
                        Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the
                        report(s) of the medical inspector dated August 31, 2016, and
                        concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within twenty
                        (20) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Tiedje, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (4)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Tiedje, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (4)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
                  (5)   Professional Education  
                  
                        (a)   I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to participate in and successfully
                              complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B.

                        (b)   I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to complete this requirement within
                              the time frame set out in the IEP.
                  
            (6)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake that, approximately eighteen (18) months
                        after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section
                        (4) above and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I
                        acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment may include a chart
                        review, direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues
                        and co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking and to abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved by the ICR
                        Committee. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Tiedje, understand and agree that if I am of the view that
                        any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will
                        have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations
                        within which to provide the College with my submissions in this
                        regard.  I further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR
                        Committee will consider my submissions and make a determination
                        regarding whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are
                        reasonable and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute
                        limitations or restrictions on my practice, and that decision will
                        be provided to me.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (6)(c) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (e)   Dr. Tiedje, hereby consent to any of the following being included
                        on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                              conditions or limitations on my practice;  
                  
                        (ii)  any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (6)(c) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Tiedje, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 
            (10)  I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (13)  I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that this Undertaking shall be posted on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (15)  I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Tiedje was the subject of a College investigation into his
                        standard of practice. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                              *     Dr. Tiedje will practise under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for
                                    twelve (12) months. 
                  
                              *     Dr. Tiedje's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                                    selected by the College within eighteen (18) months of
                                    the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Tiedje, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in section (5) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Tiedje, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Tiedje, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the professional education set out in section (5) above,
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section (5) above and which he or
                        she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.
                  
                  
            Undertaking 2 of 2

            As from May 3, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ingo Erich Heinrich
            Tiedje, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Tiedje to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                    DR.  INGO ERICH HEINRICH TIEDJE
                                            ("Dr. Tiedje")
                                                  to
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE


            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "NMS" means the Narcotics Monitoring System implemented under the
                  Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Tiedje, certificate of registration number 26517, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   Resignation of Prescribing Privileges   

                  (a)   I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that I have executed the Prescribing
                        Resignation Letter to Health Canada, which is attached hereto as
                        Schedule "A" (the "Resignation Letter").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Tiedje, consent to the College sending the Resignation
                        Letter to Health Canada on my behalf.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake and agree that I will not issue new
                        prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any of the
                        following substances:
                  
                        (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                              19);
                  
                        (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                  
                        (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                              Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c.
                              F-27); 
                  
                        (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19); 
                  
                        (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                        Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto
                        as Schedule "B"; and the current regulatory lists are attached
                        hereto as Schedule "C")
                  
                        (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics
                              Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in
                              Schedule "D");                       
                  
                        and as amended from time to time.
                  
            (4)   I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake that I will return any supplies of the
                  substances referred to in section (3)(c) above that are presently in my
                  possession, in any place, to a pharmacy in a safe and secure manner, as
                  stipulated in the College's Policy Number 8-12, "Prescribing Drugs."

            (5)   I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to inform the College of each and every location
                  that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to,
                  hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively
                  my "Practice Location(s)"), within fifteen (15) days of executing this
                  Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of
                  any and all new Practice Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing
                  practice at that location.

            (6)   Posting a Sign 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake that I shall post a sign in the waiting
                        room(s) of all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and
                        secure location, in the form set out at Schedule "E."  For further
                        clarity, this sign shall state as follows: 
                  
                                          IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
                              Dr. Tiedje must not prescribe any of the following: 
                              -     Narcotic Drugs
                              -     Narcotic Preparations
                              -     Controlled Drugs
                              -     Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                              -     All other Monitored Drugs
                  
                              Further information may be found on the College of Physicians
                              and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to post a certified translation in any
                        language in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section (6)(a) above, in the waiting room(s) of all my Practice
                        Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form
                        set out at Schedule "E." 
                  (c)   I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
                        described in section (6)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days
                        of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
                        this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I
                        will notify the College prior to providing any such services. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation(s) described in section (6)(c) prior to beginning to
                        provide services in the language(s) described in section (6)(d).
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it. 

            (9)   I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that a breach of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the
                  Discipline Committee of the College.

            (10)  I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge and agree that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc., arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code.  I understand that this
                  Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
                  available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
                  remains in effect.

            (13)  I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Tiedje was the subject of a College investigation into his
                        standard of practice.  As a result of the investigation: 
                  
                        Dr. Tiedje must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing
                        prescriptions for any of the following substances:
                  
                        (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                              19);
                  
                        (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                  
                        (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                              Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c.
                              F-27); 
                  
                        (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19); 
                  
                        (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics
                              Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);        
                  
                        and as amended from time to time.
                  
                        Dr. Tiedje must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of
                        all his Practice Locations, which states as follows: 
                  
                                          IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
                                    Dr. Tiedje must not prescribe any of the following: 
                                          -Narcotic Drugs
                                          -Narcotic Preparations
                                          -Controlled Drugs
                                          -Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                          -All other Monitored Drugs
                  
                                    Further information may be found on the College of
                                    Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at
                                    www.cpso.on.ca
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                  interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
                  patient charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems
                  necessary in order to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (15)  I, Dr. Tiedje, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP, the Drug Program Services Branch, NMS, and
                  any person or institution that may have relevant information, in order
                  for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS consent
                  forms, attached hereto as Schedule "F" and Schedule "G", respectively.

            (17)  I, Dr. Tiedje, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague(s) with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.


Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: December 23, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ingo Erich Heinrich Tiedje to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective December 23, 2016:

Dr. Tiedje was the subject of a College investigation into his standard of practice. As a result of the investigation:

• Dr. Tiedje will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months.
• Dr. Tiedje’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within eighteen (18) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.


Source: Member
Active Date: May 3, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ingo Erich Heinrich Tiedje to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 3, 2016:

Dr. Tiedje was the subject of a College investigation into his standard of practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Tiedje must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any of the following substances:

(i)Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(ii)Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(iii)Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);

(iv)Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(v)All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);
and as amended from time to time.

Dr. Tiedje must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all his Practice Locations, which states as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Dr. Tiedje must not prescribe any of the following:
- Narcotic Drugs
- Narcotic Preparations
- Controlled Drugs
- Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
- All other Monitored Drugs

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca