Tien, Julia Irene (CPSO#: 97258)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Apr 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Feb 2012 to 26 Feb 2012
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2015 to 04 Apr 2015
Elective Trainee - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Apr 2015