Tiessen, Ingrid Marilyn (CPSO#: 67876)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 May 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 May 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
29 Capital Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 0E7
Phone: (613) 792-4125
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 May 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. INGRID MARILYN TIESSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TIESSEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 04 May 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 05 May 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 01 May 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2000