Tietze, Linda (CPSO#: 70095)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 110
2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone: (519) 252-9196 Ext. 2
Fax: (519) 256-8926
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Linda Tietze Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Tietze ( CPSO# 70095 )

Business Address:
110 - 2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone Number: (519) 252-9196

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4444

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA TIETZE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TIETZE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001