Tigchelaar, Sandra Roxanne (CPSO#: 69972)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: De Lange, Sandra Roxanne (used until: 03 Dec 1996 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone: (705) 326-2208
Fax: (705) 325-9498
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tigchelaar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tigchelaar ( CPSO# 69972 )
Dr. T. Tigchelaar ( CPSO# 71277 )

Business Address:
Soldier's Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-1825

Business Address:
201 - 119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone Number: (705) 326-2208

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDRA ROXANNE TIGCHELAAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TIGCHELAAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1998