Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Tighe, Spencer Alan (CPSO#: 56885)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pinecrest Queensway ACT Team
2nd Floor
1365 Richmond Road
Ottawa ON  K2B 6R7
Phone: (613) 820-4922 Ext. 3369
Fax: (613) 820-3995
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SPENCER ALAN TIGHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TIGHE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1987