Tighe, Vincent Michael (CPSO#: 70447)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Dec 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Dec 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
Hotel Dieu Hospital
c/o Johnson 5 Room JS-008
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 2507
Electoral District: 06

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Dec 1999