Tilbe, Kimberley Stephen (CPSO#: 52439)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 500A
10 Elm Street
Sudbury ON  P3C 5N3
Phone: (705) 670-8911
Fax: (705) 670-8592
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1M1
Canada
Phone: (705) 435-6281 Ext. 213
Fax: (705) 726-3329
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tilbe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Tilbe ( CPSO# 52439 )
Dr. P. Kresan ( CPSO# 52372 )

Business Address:
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1M1
Phone Number: (705) 435-6281

Business Address:
500A - 10 Elm Street
Sudbury ON  P3C 5N3
Phone Number: (705) 670-8911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLEY STEPHEN TILBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TILBE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Oct 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Apr 1989
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1985