Tile, Lianne Ellen (CPSO#: 65635)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
E N 7 222
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4842
Fax: (416) 340-3750
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Womens College Hospital
76 Grenville St
first floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-7559
Fax: (416) 323-7739
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIANNE ELLEN TILE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TILE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1993