Tillim, Jeremy David (CPSO#: 74286)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Nevada Reno, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1999
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Sep 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2017