Tillotson, Edward Charles (CPSO#: 24855)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1972

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
218 Strathearn Avenue
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3C3
Phone: (905) 780-9484
Fax: (905) 780-1589
Electoral District: 05

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS Tel: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1
Date Received: 02 Jun 2016

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD CHARLES TILLOTSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TILLOTSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1972

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 18, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)