Tilly, William Arthur (CPSO#: 20862)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2000
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2001
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2001
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 26 Mar 2001
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 27 Jun 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2004

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Feb 2001
Summary:

 On February 26, 2001, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Tilly(s guilty plea and found him 
 guilty of professional misconduct in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of 
 the profession.

The Committee directed:

1. a recorded reprimand; 

2. six months suspension 
 effective March 26, 2001;

3. three months of the suspension to be suspended subject to meeting 
 with the terms of his                 undertaking dated February 7, 2001 as follows:

(a)  to 
 participate and fully cooperate in the Physician Review Program (PREP), including                  
    abiding by any recommendations by PREP or the Physician Enhancement Department of the          
 College
(b)  to pay the enrolment fee in PREP in the sum of $3,700 
(c)  to complete the College(s 
 Medical Record Keeping Course for Physicians on or before                    October 2001; and,  
 
(d)  to fully cooperate with the College in a practice assessment approximately one year after    
             the completion of PREP, all such costs to be borne by the College.

4. That any breach 
 of the terms of the undertaking will result in the Registrar directing that Dr.            Tilly(s 
 certificate of registration be immediately suspended for the remaining three months of         the 
  suspension period ordered by the Discipline Committee;

5. That the Registrar immediately impose 
 a term, condition and limitation upon the certificate of         registration of Dr. Tilly that he 
 not be permitted in his practice to prescribe, possess or              purchase narcotics, 
 controlled drugs or benzodiazepines; and,  

6. That Dr. Tilly forthwith pay the costs of this 
 hearing fixed in the sum of $1,000.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 26, 2001