Timmons, Pauline Marie (CPSO#: 76095)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 20B
385 Frederick Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 2P2
Phone: (519) 747-1200
Fax: (519) 747-1560
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Wilfrid Laurier University
Health Service
75 University Avenue
Waterloo ON  N2L 3C5
Canada
Phone: (519) 884-1970 Ext. 3146
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAULINE MARIE TIMMONS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TIMMONS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2003