Timms, Fiona Jane (CPSO#: 74023)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Otago, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
Exchange Resident - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Dec 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002