Timoumi, Tarik (CPSO#: 99561)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Paris, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2012 to 15 Nov 2012
PEAP - Resident - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 16 Nov 2012 to 30 Apr 2013
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 24 Aug 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 25 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017