Timpson, Deborah Jean (CPSO#: 68044)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 MacKay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone: (613) 732-3675 Ext. 7134
Fax: (613) 732-2224
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH JEAN TIMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TIMPSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999