Ting, Robert Hsiao-Ping (CPSO#: 59510)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
78 Corporate Drive
Unit 10
Scarborough ON  M1H 3G4
Phone: (416) 279-0855 Ext. 238
Fax: (416) 279-0857
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tam & Ting Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 5 2017


Corporation Name: Robert H. Ting Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ting ( CPSO# 59510 )

Business Address:
10 - 78 Corporate Drive
Scarborough ON  M1H 3G4
Phone Number: (416) 279-0855

Business Address:
Bridgepoint Hospital
14 St. Matthews Road
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone Number: (416) 461-8252

Business Address:
Rouge Valley
Ajax and Pickering Health Centre Site
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
Scarborough Hospital, General Site
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 03 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT HSIAO-PING TING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TING is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1989