Ting, Yuk Joseph (CPSO#: 97237)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 12 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Feb 2012 to 24 Feb 2012
Elective Trainee - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2012 to 25 Jan 2013
Elective Trainee - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 28 Jan 2013 to 30 Apr 2013
Elective Trainee - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2013