Tingey, David Paul (CPSO#: 55544)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jan 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ivey Eye Institute
St Joseph's Health Care London
268 Grosvenor Street
PO Box 5777
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 685-8351
Fax: (519) 646-6076
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David P. Tingey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Tingey ( CPSO# 55544 )

Business Address:
Ivey Eye Institute
St Joseph's Health Care London
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 685-8351

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 15 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID PAUL TINGEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TINGEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1988