Tinmouth, Alan Hall (CPSO#: 29573)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2015