Tipler, Karen Elizabeth (CPSO#: 59705)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: Catterall, Karen Elizabeth (used until: 23 Jun 1989 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 20 Sep 1991 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001