Tirkanits, Beatrix Clara Iren (CPSO#: 54870)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Dec 1987

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Dec 1987